NH HB663 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Enrolled 05/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the definition of agriculture and existing agricultural uses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of agriculture and existing agricultural uses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled 05/23/2019
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19
2019-05-08HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1488s (Rep. Gourgue): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 2
2019-04-25SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1488s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14
2019-04-25SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1488s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14
2019-04-18SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1488s, 04/25/2019; Senate Calendar 19
2019-04-18SenateSpecial Order to 04/25/2019, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/18/2019 Senate Journal 13
2019-04-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1488s, 04/18/2019; Senate Calendar 18
2019-04-05SenateHearing: 04/11/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:40 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; Senate Calendar 17A
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0751h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 21
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0751h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 21
2019-03-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0751h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 8
2019-02-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/05/2019 09:55 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-02-26House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/05/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-02-08HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-02-06House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/12/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-30HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/07/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 24

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback