NH HB661 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Retained in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a private right of action for toxin exposure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a private right of action for toxin exposure.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-02-05HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 24

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback