NH HB659 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016; Chapter 130; Eff. 5/27/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to eligibility for an absentee ballot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to eligibility for an absentee ballot.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-31HouseSigned by Governor Hassan 05/27/2016; Chapter 130; Eff. 5/27/2016
2016-05-23HouseEnrolled 05/19/2016
2016-05-20SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19
2016-05-17HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1914e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 128
2016-05-13SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1914e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/12/2016); Senate Journal 18
2016-04-28SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/28/2016; Senate Journal 15
2016-04-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/28/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2016-03-09SenateHearing: 03/16/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 10
2016-02-22SenateIntroduced 02/18/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 6
2016-01-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2496h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 35
2016-01-06HouseAmendment #2015-2496h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 35
2015-11-12HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2496h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 6
2015-10-08HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2015-09-15HouseExecutive Session: 10/20/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2015-08-17HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2015-02-17HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-11HouseExecutive Session: 2/12/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2015-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 2/5/2015 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG. 234

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback