NH HB654 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Conference Committee Report 2334c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/22/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study the regulation and taxation of vacation rentals and short-term rentals, and relative to examinations of vacation and short-term rentals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study the regulation and taxation of vacation rentals and short-term rentals, and relative to examinations of vacation and short-term rentals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1709s (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Re-refer to committee (Y: 9 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22HouseConference Committee Report 2334c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/22/2017
2017-06-22SenateConference Committee Report #2017-2334c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/22/2017; Senate Journal 20
2017-06-15SenateConference Committee Report Filed, #2017-2334c; 06/15/2017
2017-06-09HouseConference Committee Meeting: 06/14/2017 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 302
2017-06-08SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Sanborn, Bradley, D'Allesandro; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19
2017-06-08SenateSen. Sanborn Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19
2017-06-01HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Hunt, Biggie, Butler, Ohm 06/01/2017
2017-06-01HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1709s and Requests CofC (Reps. Hunt, Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017
2017-05-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1709s, Regular Calendar 21Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
2017-05-18SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-1709s, Regular Calendar 15Y-7N, Amendment Adopted; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
2017-05-18SenateSen. Fuller Clark Moved to Rerefer, Regular Calendar 9Y-13N, Motion Failed; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
2017-05-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1709s, 05/18/2017; Senate Calendar 23
2017-03-30SenateHearing: 04/05/2017, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 17
2017-03-29SenateIntroduced 03/23/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 11
2017-03-23HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 7
2017-03-15HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/23/2017 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 4
2017-03-08HouseExecutive Session: 03/15/2017 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-02-21House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-02-21House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/07/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Ways and Means 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 7
2017-02-15HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0374h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 7
2017-02-15HouseAmendment #2017-0374h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 7
2017-02-10HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0374h (NT) for 02/15/2017 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 8
2017-02-02HouseExecutive Session: 02/07/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2017-02-02HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2017-01-25HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2017-01-25HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 24

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback