NH HB652 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-06 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to suicide prevention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to suicide prevention.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-15SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-02SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-05-02SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-04-23SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-18SenateHearing: 04/23/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 19
2019-03-18SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 9
2019-02-27HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0423h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 7
2019-02-27HouseAmendment # 2019-0423h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 7
2019-02-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0423h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 6
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-23House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-23House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback