NH HB651 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB651
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the department of education and local school districts to contract with transportation network companies to provide school transportation services.
Title
Authorizing the department of education and local school districts to contract with transportation network companies to provide school transportation services.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Rep. Aidan Ankarberg [R] | Rep. Thomas Walsh [R] |
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-03-10 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/24/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/16/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2023 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 24 |
Same As/Similar To
HB651 (Carry Over) 2023-05-10 - Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207