NH HB650 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study the economic challenges of employed persons serving in the New Hampshire legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study the economic challenges of employed persons serving in the New Hampshire legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - OTP (Y: 203 N: 141 NV: 33 Abs: 23) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
2019-04-25SenateHearing: 05/08/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 20
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-07HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-141 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 52
2019-02-28HouseSpecial Order to 03/07/2019 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 62
2019-02-21HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-21HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 7-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 31
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback