NH HB65 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB65
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-07 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted DV 194-164 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-07 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted DV 194-164 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Requiring food service establishments to establish food allergy awareness procedures.
Title
Requiring food service establishments to establish food allergy awareness procedures.
Sponsors
Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] | Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] | Rep. Janice Schmidt [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] |
Rep. Bruce Cohen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-07 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted DV 194-164 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study HB65 10/29/2021 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 20 |
2021-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-10-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-08-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/07/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-03-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98917516497 (if necessary) |
2021-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95215897452 |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing: 02/16/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95175123874 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 34 |
Same As/Similar To
HB65 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=41&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB65 |