NH HB643 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB643
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the date of the state primary election.
Title
Relative to the date of the state primary election.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 38 |
2019-11-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 7 |
2019-10-04 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-09-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-02-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 23 |
Same As/Similar To
HB643 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)