NH HB64 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the commission on demographic trends to consider data on race and ethnicity for the purpose of increasing racial and ethnic diversity in New Hampshire.
Title
Requiring the commission on demographic trends to consider data on race and ethnicity for the purpose of increasing racial and ethnic diversity in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 6 |
2023-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-02-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB 64 02/16/2023 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 5 |
2023-02-15 | House | Public Hearing: 02/16/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |