NH HB639 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 16-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to speed limits in cities and towns.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to speed limits in cities and towns.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 16-1; Consent Calendar)
2019-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 02/19/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Transportation

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback