NH HB639 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Signed by Governor 06/06/2013; Effective 08/05/2013; Chapter 0072
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Signed by Governor 06/06/2013; Effective 08/05/2013; Chapter 0072
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to beverage container and packaging approval.
Title
Relative to beverage container and packaging approval.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor 06/06/2013; Effective 08/05/2013; Chapter 0072 |
2013-04-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1257 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/18/13; Senate Calendar 16 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing:=== ROOM CHANGE === 4/2/13, Room 100, State House, 2:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |
2013-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0688h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.837 |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendment #0688h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.837 |
2013-03-06 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0688h; House Calendar 23 PG.642 |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0688h for Mar 20 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 23, PG.578 |
2013-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/22/2013 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.204 |