NH HB638 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 198-156 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring health care providers to provide an opioid disclosure form to patients for whom an opioid is prescribed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring health care providers to provide an opioid disclosure form to patients for whom an opioid is prescribed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 198-156 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 43
2019-02-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0287h
2019-02-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 13
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-06HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback