NH HB637 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 297; Eff: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to criminal history background checks by employers and public agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to criminal history background checks by employers and public agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Sen. Chandley Floor Amendment 2361s (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-30HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 297; Eff: 07/01/2019
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56
2019-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1965s and 2361s (Rep. Cushing): Motion Adopted DV 211-131 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 2
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2019-1965s, and 2019-2361s, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateSen. Chandley Floor Amendment # 2019-2361s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1965s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1965s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
2019-05-23SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateSen. Chandley Moved to Remove HB 637-FN from the Consent Calendar; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1965s, 05/23/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23
2019-03-28SenateHearing: 04/02/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:10 am; Senate Calendar 16
2019-03-18SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9
2019-02-27HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0047h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 6
2019-02-27HouseAmendment # 2019-0047h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 6
2019-02-15HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0047h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 5
2019-01-29House==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-23House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback