NH HB636 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to required education for zoning board of adjustment members.
Title
Relative to required education for zoning board of adjustment members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 8 |
2023-02-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB636-FN 02/15/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 7 |
2023-02-13 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/16/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 02/15/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2023 10:20 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 23 |