NH HB636 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB636
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-10 - Executive Session: 10/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building306
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-10 - Executive Session: 10/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building306
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a department of military and veterans services.
Title
Establishing a department of military and veterans services.
Sponsors
Rep. Russell Ober [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Robert Theberge [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building306 |
2018-05-23 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 06/05/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-05-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 06/06/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-08 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted DV 273-72 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 31 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/07/2018 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 22 |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/25/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Executive Departments and Administration 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 44 |
2018-01-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2441h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 44 |
2018-01-09 | House | Amendment # 2017-2441h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 44 |
2018-01-03 | House | Special Order to 1/9/2018 Without Objection House Journal 1 P. 104 |
2017-10-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2441h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-0; Regular Calendar) |
2017-09-06 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/27/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-09-06 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/20/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-02-08 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 3 P. 23 |
Same As/Similar To
HB636 (Carry Over) 2017-10-06 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2441h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-0; Regular Calendar)