NH HB634 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed By Governor 07/09/2013; Effective 9/7/2013; Chapter 0202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed By Governor 07/09/2013; Effective 9/7/2013; Chapter 0202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to water resource management and protection plans in municipal master plans.
Title
Relative to water resource management and protection plans in municipal master plans.
Sponsors
Rep. Judith Spang [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. David Borden [D] | Rep. Jane Beaulieu [D] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Donna Schlachman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed By Governor 07/09/2013; Effective 9/7/2013; Chapter 0202 |
2013-06-14 | House | Enrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-05 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1625s (Rep Porter): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1586 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1625s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1625s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1625s, 5/23/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Hearing: 4/17/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0598h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.766-767 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0598h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.766-767 |
2013-03-05 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0598h; House Calendar 22, PG.564 |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0598h for Mar 13 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.510-511 |
2013-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-02-12 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG.203 |