NH HB634 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Senate Sen. Houde Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Senate Sen. Houde Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payment of guardian ad litem and mediator fees in marital cases where the parties are indigent.
Title
Relative to payment of guardian ad litem and mediator fees in marital cases where the parties are indigent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Senate Sen. Houde Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Committee Amendment 1784s, Not Voted On; Senate Journal 16 | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1784s, New Title, 5/11/11; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Hearing: 4/28/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 20 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-02 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.671-672 | |
2011-02-18 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 2 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.385 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/17/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 ==Executive Session to Follow== | |
2011-01-25 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 11, PG. 194 |