NH HB633 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to electric distribution company market share, prohibiting certain electric rate increases, and requiring enforcement against Eversource.
Title
Relative to electric distribution company market share, prohibiting certain electric rate increases, and requiring enforcement against Eversource.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB633-FN 02/03/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 10 |
2023-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-18 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2023 04:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-18 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/23/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 23 |