NH HB632 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB632
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/20/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/20/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Banning a sentence of life imprisonment without parole for a juvenile convicted of homicide.
Title
Banning a sentence of life imprisonment without parole for a juvenile convicted of homicide.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Berch [D] | Rep. Joe Schapiro [D] | Rep. Mary Walz [D] | Rep. Wendy Chase [D] |
Rep. Diane Langley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-13 | House | Executive Session: 10/20/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-09-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/05/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-08-25 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-08-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/07/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2021-03-31 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Public Hearing: 03/10/2021 11:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92387218591 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-15 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 57 |
Same As/Similar To
HB632 (Carry Over) 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/20/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203