NH HB632 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 332-19 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the education tax credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the education tax credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - Table (Y: 332 N: 19 NV: 9 Abs: 40) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseLay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 332-19 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 47
2019-03-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 16
2019-03-08HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-12House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 03/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204
2019-01-23House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback