NH HB631 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2021; Chapter 86; Eff: 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2021; Chapter 86; Eff: 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to regulation of interpreters for the deaf, deaf blind, and hard of hearing.
Title
Relative to regulation of interpreters for the deaf, deaf blind, and hard of hearing.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Pearson [R] | Rep. Gary Woods [D] | Rep. Frances Nutter-Upham [D] | Rep. Norman Major [R] |
Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] | Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2021; Chapter 86; Eff: 01/01/2022 |
2021-06-11 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 21 |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/10/2021); Senate Journal 19 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/06/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/28/2021, 10:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0439h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 28 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0439h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 28 |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0439h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 14 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2021 11:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99659562277 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 57 |