NH HB631 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 587
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 587
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the New Hampshire state house bicentennial education and commemoration fund.
Title
Making an appropriation to the New Hampshire state house bicentennial education and commemoration fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 587 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 4 (Vote 21-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 358 |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-02-04 | House | Division I Work Session: 2/10/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Finance; House Journal 12, PG. 233 |