NH HB631 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.753
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.753
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring school boards to establish a policy allowing parents to send their children to an out-of-district school.
Title
Requiring school boards to establish a policy allowing parents to send their children to an out-of-district school.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.753 |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 13 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2013-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/21/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 ==ROOM CHANGE (Orig Legislative Office Building 207)== |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG.203 |