NH HB63 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 189-158 02/23/2022 House Journal 7 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to religious use of land and structures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to religious use of land and structures.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-23HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 189-158 02/23/2022 House Journal 7 P. 10
2023-02-15HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB63 01/30/2023 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 21
2023-01-24HouseExecutive Session: 01/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208
2023-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2023 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208
2022-12-23HouseIntroduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Judiciary

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback