NH HB626 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-194 04/06/2023 House Journal 12 P. 210
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-194 04/06/2023 House Journal 12 P. 210
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the department of education to administer the education freedom account.
Title
Requiring the department of education to administer the education freedom account.
Sponsors
Rep. David Luneau [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - ITL (Y: 195 N: 194 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - ITL (Y: 195 N: 194 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - OTP (Y: 183 N: 180 NV: 20 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - OTP (Y: 183 N: 180 NV: 20 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - ITL (Y: 195 N: 194 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - OTP (Y: 183 N: 180 NV: 20 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - OTP (Y: 183 N: 180 NV: 20 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-194 04/06/2023 House Journal 12 P. 210 |
2023-03-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2023-03-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/29/2023 (Vote 13-12; Regular Calendar) |
2023-03-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/28/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-03-23 | House | Division Work Session: 03/10/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2023-02-24 | House | Division Work Session: 03/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Finance 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 52 |
2023-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 183-180 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/03/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 20 |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 23 |