NH HB626 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2021; Chapter 66; I. Sec. 10 Eff: 07/01/2024 / II. Rem. Eff: 06/08/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to historic horse racing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to historic horse racing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/08/2021; Chapter 66; I. Sec. 10 Eff: 07/01/2024 / II. Rem. Eff: 06/08/2021
2021-05-26HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 104
2021-05-26SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/20/2021); Senate Journal 17
2021-05-13HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-1354e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 103
2021-05-12SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-1354e Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Amendment Adopted, (In recess of 05/06/2021); Senate Journal 15
2021-04-29SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13
2021-04-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/29/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21
2021-04-14SenateRemote Hearing: 04/19/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-07HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 223-152 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 63
2021-03-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-24HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 16-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 27
2021-02-18HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/03/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92309184005 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-02-18HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94528213728 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-27HousePublic Hearing: 02/11/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99381153388 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 57

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback