NH HB625 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB625
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-11 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-11 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the calculation of average daily membership in attendance and average daily membership in residence for school districts.
Title
Relative to the calculation of average daily membership in attendance and average daily membership in residence for school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-08-16 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/07/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-05-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-03-10 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 23 |
Same As/Similar To
HB625 (Carry Over) 2023-09-11 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207