NH HB625 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Pending Motion Committee Amendment # 2021-1714s; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the protection of fetal life.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the protection of fetal life.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Reconsider (Y: 152 N: 197 NV: 14 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - OTP (Y: 191 N: 160 NV: 12 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - ITL (Y: 162 N: 190 NV: 11 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - Reconsider (Y: 0 N: 14 NV: 355 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - OTP (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 359 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - ITL (Y: 0 N: 11 NV: 358 Abs: 29) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-27SenatePending Motion Committee Amendment # 2021-1714s; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
2021-05-27SenateSen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
2021-05-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1714s, 05/27/2021; Senate Calendar 25A
2021-03-24SenateRemote Hearing: 03/30/2021, 01:30 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
2021-02-24HouseReferral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 47(f) 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 86
2021-02-24HouseReferred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 79
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-160 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 74
2021-02-24HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 162-190 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 74
2021-02-24HouseReconsider (Rep. Spillane): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 152-197 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 79
2021-02-18HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2021-02-18HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 22
2021-02-03HousePublic Hearing: 02/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96805083773 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 57

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=541&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB625
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=519&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=31&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0625&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB625&ddlsponsors=&lsr=541
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=32&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0625&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB625&ddlsponsors=&lsr=541
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=33&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0625&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB625&ddlsponsors=&lsr=541
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=31&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0625&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB625&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0541
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=32&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0625&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB625&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0541
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=33&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0625&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB625&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0541
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=397&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0625&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB625&ddlsponsors=&lsr=541
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=397&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0625&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB625&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0541

Bill Comments

feedback