NH HB624 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB624
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-20 - Full Committee Work Session: 11/10/2021 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-20 - Full Committee Work Session: 11/10/2021 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Decreasing the fee to file a petition for a declaratory ruling with the site evaluation committee.
Title
Decreasing the fee to file a petition for a declaratory ruling with the site evaluation committee.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Vose [R] | Rep. Douglas Thomas [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/10/2021 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-10-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/10/2021 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 104 |
2021-10-13 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/04/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-10-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/04/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2021-09-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/07/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-09-21 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-09-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:50 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2021-09-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/15/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-08-18 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-08-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/07/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-30 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Public Hearing: 03/10/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99357402693 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 90 |
2021-02-24 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Adjutant): Motion Failed DV 149-194 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 90 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 89 |
2021-02-24 | House | FLAM # 2021-0465h (Rep. Somssich): Amendment Failed DV 132-204 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 89 |
2021-02-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-02-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 24 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92874903669 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 57 |
Same As/Similar To
HB624 (Carry Over) 2021-10-20 - Full Committee Work Session: 11/10/2021 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204