NH HB624 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Waiving the residency requirement for in-state tuition rates for veterans attending the university system of New Hampshire.
Title
Waiving the residency requirement for in-state tuition rates for veterans attending the university system of New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/2/13; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 4/2/13, Room 103, State House, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance |
2013-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0559h: Motion Adopted Division Vote 281-28; House Journal 29, PG.990 |
2013-03-21 | House | Amendment #0559h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 29, PG.990 |
2013-03-05 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0559h; House Calendar 23 PG.641 |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0559h for Mar 20 (Vote 17-3; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.589-590 |
2013-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/21/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 ==ROOM CHANGE (Orig Legislative Office Building 207)== |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG.203 |