NH HB619 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB619
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Designating police and fire dispatchers as group II members of the retirement system.
Title
Designating police and fire dispatchers as group II members of the retirement system.
Sponsors
Rep. Douglas Trottier [R] | Rep. Richard Littlefield [R] | Rep. Juliet Harvey-Bolia [R] | Rep. Mike Bordes [R] |
Rep. Travis O'Hara [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB619-FN 10/29/2021 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 11 |
2021-10-25 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-08-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/08/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2021-02-18 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/92995497899 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 57 |
Same As/Similar To
HB619 (Carry Over) 2021-10-25 - Executive Session: 10/25/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=485&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB619 |