NH HB619 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB619
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-19 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2428h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-19 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2428h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to medical services for prisoners.
Title
Relative to medical services for prisoners.
Sponsors
Rep. Kendall Snow [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. John Fothergill [R] | Rep. Linda Kenison [D] |
Rep. James MacKay [D] | Rep. Mary Freitas [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2428h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-04 | House | Executive Session: 10/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-09-12 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-08-18 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-02-16 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2017 Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 11:40 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 22 |
Same As/Similar To
HB619 (Carry Over) 2017-10-19 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2428h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)