NH HB615 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Sen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Sen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reducing the penalty for certain first offense drug possession charges.
Title
Reducing the penalty for certain first offense drug possession charges.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Seaworth [R] | Rep. Kevin Verville [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] | Rep. Casey Conley [D] |
Rep. Terry Roy [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1418s (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Divide Remainder (Y: 2 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Divide 2 & 5 (Y: 6 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Divide Remainder (Y: 2 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Divide 2 & 5 (Y: 6 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2021-1418s, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Amendment Failed; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Remainder of Bill and Effective Date, Regular Calendar 2Y-22N, Motion Failed; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Sections 2 and 5, Regular Calendar 6Y-18N, Motion Failed; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Sen. Whitley Moved to divide the Question on Ought to Pass; Sections 2 and 5 and then the Remainder of Bill and Effective Date; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Sen. Whitley Moved Ought to Pass; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 14 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Special Order to 05/13/21, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/06/2021; Senate Calendar 22 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Special Order to 05/06/2021, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/29/2021; Senate Calendar 21 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/13/2021, 02:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 24-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 26 |
2021-03-10 | House | Public Hearing: 03/10/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99357402693 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 30 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0124h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 30 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0124h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 30 |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0124h (Vote 15-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 17 |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91386255102 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 56 |