NH HB605 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 193; I. Sec. 2 & 9 Eff: as provided in Sec. 10 II. Sec. 7/8/11/12 Eff: as provided in Sec. 13 III. Rem. Eff: 10/09/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the therapeutic cannabis program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the therapeutic cannabis program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1234s (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-16HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 193; I. Sec. 2 & 9 Eff: as provided in Sec. 10 II. Sec. 7/8/11/12 Eff: as provided in Sec. 13 III. Rem. Eff: 10/09/2021
2021-07-23HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-21SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-07-12HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2052e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-08SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2052e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-06-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1603s (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 12
2021-05-27SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
2021-05-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/27/2021; Senate Calendar 25A
2021-05-20SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1603s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16
2021-05-20SenateSen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2021-1603s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16
2021-05-20SenateSen. Sherman Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16
2021-05-06SenatePending Motion Ought to Pass; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14
2021-05-06SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 18Y-5N, Motion Adopted; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14
2021-05-06SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-1234s, Regular Calendar 10Y-13N, Amendment Failed; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14
2021-04-28SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1234s, 05/06/2021; Senate Calendar 22
2021-04-15SenateRemote Hearing: 04/21/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0646h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 91
2021-04-08HouseAmendment # 2021-0646h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 91
2021-03-16HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0645h
2021-03-16HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0646h (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18
2021-03-02HouseExecutive Session: 03/02/2021 12:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99282187833
2021-02-23HousePublic Hearing: 02/23/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95885653389 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 56

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=14&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB605
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=8&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=8
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=8
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=363&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0605&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB605&ddlsponsors=&lsr=14
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=364&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0605&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB605&ddlsponsors=&lsr=14
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=394&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0605&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB605&ddlsponsors=&lsr=14
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=390&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0605&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB605&ddlsponsors=&lsr=14

Bill Comments 750

feedback