NH HB603 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Lay HB603 on Table (Rep. Luneau): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Lay HB603 on Table (Rep. Luneau): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to education service providers under the education freedom accounts program.
Title
Relative to education service providers under the education freedom accounts program.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Tanner [D] | Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Rep. Stephen Woodcock [D] | Rep. Catherine Rombeau [D] |
Rep. Brian Sullivan [D] | Rep. David Luneau [D] | Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Lay HB603 on Table (Rep. Luneau): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 75 |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/15/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 23 |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-02-16 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2023 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 22 |