NH HB60 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB60
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 192-165 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 192-165 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Raising the minimum age of marriage.
Title
Raising the minimum age of marriage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 192-165 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-09-21 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 20 |
2021-08-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/15/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session: 03/11/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91927749754 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2021 01:45 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96640856922 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 33 |
Same As/Similar To
HB60 (Carry Over) 2021-09-21 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar)
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=3&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB60 |