NH HB598 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Lay HB598 on Table (Rep. Edwards): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Lay HB598 on Table (Rep. Edwards): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to funding maternal mortality reviews.
Title
Relative to funding maternal mortality reviews.
Sponsors
Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Terry Roy [R] | Rep. Mark Pearson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | Lay HB598 on Table (Rep. Edwards): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 43 |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB598-FN 02/08/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 6 |
2023-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 3 P. 22 |