NH HB597 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-13 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the expectation of privacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the expectation of privacy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-13HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208
2021-09-08HouseExecutive Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2021-03-16HouseRetained in Committee
2021-03-10HouseExecutive Session: 03/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95164452682
2021-03-05HousePublic Hearing: 03/05/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97676008758 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-13HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 56

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback