NH HB597 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-28 - House ==CANCELLED== Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-28 - House ==CANCELLED== Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Summary
Revising the property tax relief program in order to cap education tax payments at one percent of adjusted gross income.
Title
Revising the property tax relief program in order to cap education tax payments at one percent of adjusted gross income.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-28 | House ==CANCELLED== Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-09-28 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/5/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-09-22 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/28/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-09-10 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-03-17 | House Referred to Ways and Means for Interim Study; House Journal 26, PG.1365 | |
2010-01-13 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.440 | |
2010-01-06 | House Special Ordered to Next Session Date in Regular Calendar Order; House Journal 6, PG.310 | |
2009-11-19 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 Regular Calendar (vote 11-8); House Calendar 2, PG.100 | |
2009-11-02 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/18/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 9:00 Amendment)== | |
2009-11-01 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session 11/17/2009 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-10-15 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/05/2009 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-04-15 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 4/21/2009 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-03-19 | House Retained in Committee | |
2009-03-16 | House Executive Session: 3/18/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 (Continued 3/19/09 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 If Needed) | |
2009-03-16 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/17/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-03-11 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/16/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-03-03 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/6/2009 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-02-04 | House Public Hearing: 2/11/2009 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-01-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG.234 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=301&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |