NH HB597 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 34; Eff: 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to sales of beverages and wine hosted by other licensees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to sales of beverages and wine hosted by other licensees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 34; Eff: 05/15/2019
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/25/2019); Senate Journal 15
2019-04-25HouseEnrolled 04/11/2019
2019-04-11SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12
2019-04-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 17
2019-03-27SenateHearing: 04/02/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 16
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0780h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 10
2019-03-14HouseFLAM # 2019-0780h (Rep. Williams): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 10
2019-03-07HouseSpecial Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection House Journal 8 P. 60
2019-03-07HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Williams) 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 3
2019-02-27HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/07/2019 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 3
2019-02-13House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/21/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-02-07House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-02-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2019 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 21

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback