NH HB595 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/17/2023; Chapter 36; Eff: 07/16/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/17/2023; Chapter 36; Eff: 07/16/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the oversight of the public deposit investment pool.
Title
Relative to the oversight of the public deposit investment pool.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/17/2023; Chapter 36; Eff: 07/16/2023 |
2023-05-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/04/2023 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/11/2023); Senate Journal 15 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/13/2023; Senate Calendar 17 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2023, Room 100, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0808h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 6 |
2023-03-22 | House | Amendment # 2023-0808h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 6 |
2023-03-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0808h (Vote 03/14/2023; 19-0) House Calendar 16 P. 5 |
2023-02-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building210-211 |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-23 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-02-02 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 22 |