NH HB591 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-29 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass 10/28/2021 (Vote ; 17-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to certain liquor license fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to certain liquor license fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - House - OTPA (Y: 203 N: 147 NV: 19 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Reconsider (Y: 203 N: 137 NV: 29 Abs: 29) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass 10/28/2021 (Vote ; 17-4)
2021-10-06HouseExecutive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2021-08-31HouseDivision I Work Session: 09/14/2021 03:45 pm Legislative Office Building 212
2021-03-30HouseRetained in Committee
2021-03-25HouseExecutive Session: 03/29/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660
2021-03-04HouseDivision I Work Session: 03/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94444579237
2021-02-24HouseReferred to Finance 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 65
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass with Amendment : Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-147 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 61
2021-02-24HouseReconsider (Rep. Wuelper): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-137 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 61
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0269h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 60
2021-02-24HouseAmendment # 2021-0269h: Amendment Adopted DV 205-145 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 60
2021-02-16HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0269h (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 20
2021-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/94106022547 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from thetime the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-13HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 55

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback