NH HB590 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 202-148 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 202-148 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to paid sick time.
Title
Relative to paid sick time.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Wallner [D] | Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] | Rep. Safiya Wazir [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] |
Rep. Kristina Schultz [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Becky Whitley [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - ITL (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 355 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 202-148 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 81 |
2021-02-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-02-17 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 23 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following linkTo join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93123047403 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 55 |