NH HB588 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 177; Eff: 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to presidential nominations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to presidential nominations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 177; Eff: 09/08/2019
2019-06-12HouseEnrolled 06/06/2019
2019-06-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-16SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 23
2019-05-08SenateHearing: 05/16/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 22
2019-03-18SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9
2019-02-27HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 9
2019-02-15HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 7
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 21

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback