NH HB580 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB580
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-18 - Full Committee Work Session: 05/24/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-18 - Full Committee Work Session: 05/24/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a children's vision screening initiative within the state Medicaid program.
Title
Establishing a children's vision screening initiative within the state Medicaid program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/24/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 21 |
Same As/Similar To
HB580 (Carry Over) 2023-05-18 - Full Committee Work Session: 05/24/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207