NH HB580 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Special Order to Regular Calendar of next Session day Without Objection House Journal 4 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the approval of the governor before the New Hampshire National Guard can be deployed overseas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the approval of the governor before the New Hampshire National Guard can be deployed overseas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseSpecial Order to Regular Calendar of next Session day Without Objection House Journal 4 P. 46
2021-02-16HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2021-02-16HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 33
2021-02-03HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93009507127
2021-01-20HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2021 10:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95866113093 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened.
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 2 P. 54

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback