NH HB580 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 247; Eff. 7/18/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to fantasy sports contests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to fantasy sports contests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment 1466s (Y: 4 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 247; Eff. 7/18/2017
2017-07-05HouseEnrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 27
2017-07-03SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-29HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2388e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 26
2017-06-29SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2388e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-22HouseConference Committee Report 2337c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 21
2017-06-22SenateConference Committee Report #2017-2337c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/22/2017; Senate Journal 20
2017-06-15SenateConference Committee Report Filed, #2017-2337c; 06/15/2017
2017-06-15SenateConferee Change; Senator Morse Replaces Senator Sanborn; Senate Journal 20
2017-06-09HouseConference Committee Meeting: 06/14/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-06-08SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Sanborn, Bradley, Feltes; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19
2017-06-08SenateSen. Sanborn Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19
2017-06-08HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Azarian, Abrami, Ohm, Ames 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 2
2017-06-08HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2008s and Requests CofC (Rep. Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 2
2017-06-01SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-2008s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-06-01SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-2008s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18
2017-05-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2008s, 05/31/2017; Senate Calendar 25
2017-05-04SenateHearing: 05/09/2017, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 22
2017-04-20SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 20Y-3N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-20SenateSen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2017-1466s, Regular Calendar 4Y-19N, Amendment Failed; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/20/2017; Senate Calendar 19
2017-03-30SenateHearing: 04/05/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 17
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0657h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 49
2017-03-08HouseAmendment #2017-0657h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 49
2017-03-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0657h (NT) for 03/08/2017 (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar)
2017-03-01HouseExecutive Session: 02/28/2017 Legislative Office Building 202
2017-02-15HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/22/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-01-31House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-01-25House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2017-01-20HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback