NH HB58 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 192-182 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 192-182 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting payment of subminimum wages.
Title
Prohibiting payment of subminimum wages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - OTPA (Y: 176 N: 194 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - OTPA (Y: 176 N: 194 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - OTPA (Y: 176 N: 194 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 192-182 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 46 |
2023-03-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0070h: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 176-194 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 44 |
2023-03-16 | House | Amendment # 2023-0070h: Amendment Adopted DV 184-182 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 |
2023-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/08/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 14 |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |