NH HB579 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB579
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Lay HB 579 on Table (Rep. Umberger): Motion Adopted DV 186-147 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Lay HB 579 on Table (Rep. Umberger): Motion Adopted DV 186-147 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to registration of semi-trailers.
Title
Relative to registration of semi-trailers.
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Rep. Ryan Smith [R] | Rep. Howard Moffett [D] | Rep. Gregory Hill [R] |
Rep. Scott Wallace [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 165 N: 167 NV: 26 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2018-02-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 172 N: 163 NV: 29 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 172 N: 163 NV: 29 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Lay HB 579 on Table (Rep. Umberger): Motion Adopted DV 186-147 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 32 |
2018-03-22 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Eaton): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 165-167 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 30 |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/21/2018 (Vote 22-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 19 |
2018-03-15 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/14/2018 Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-03-12 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Division II Work Session: 03/14/2018 10:05 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-03-07 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division II Work Session: 03/13/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-03-07 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Division II Work Session: 03/09/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-03-02 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-03-01 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division II Work Session: 03/08/2018 04:30 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-02-28 | House | Division II Work Session: 02/28/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-02-21 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division II Work Session: 02/21/2018 03:30 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-02-13 | House | ==RECESSED== Division II Work Session: 02/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Finance 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 54 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0866h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 172-163 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 52 |
2018-02-08 | House | Amendment # 2018-0866h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 51 |
2018-02-08 | House | Special Order to next order of business (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 50 |
2018-01-09 | House | Special Order to next session day Without Objection |
2018-01-03 | House | Special Order to 1/9/2018 Without Objection House Journal 1 P. 104 |
2017-10-31 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-10-31 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0866h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 27 |
2017-10-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-09-08 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/19/2017 02:05 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-09-06 | House | ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/19/2017 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-08-17 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/06/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-03-16 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2017 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/07/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 48 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 48 |
2017-02-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-02-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/15/2017 (Vote 9-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 22 |
2017-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 20 |
Same As/Similar To
HB579 (Carry Over) 2017-10-31 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate